Name | Term | Cesta | Cena (pro STM) | Slevy (pro STM) | |
Adam Addar | 26. 10. 2018 - 28. 10. 2018 | Own | | | |
Filip Anděl | 26. 10. 2018 - 30. 10. 2018 | Own | | | |
Konstantin Aprik | Throughout | Organize by GHBS - only back | | | |
Robin Balaš | 26. 10. 2018 - 28. 10. 2018 | Own | | | |
Antonín Běťák | 31. 10. 2018 - 4. 11. 2018 | Own | | | |
Františka Běťáková | 31. 10. 2018 - 4. 11. 2018 | Own | | | |
David Blažek | 2. 11. 2018 - 4. 11. 2018 | Own | | | |
Filip Blažek | 2. 11. 2018 - 4. 11. 2018 | Own | | | |
Richard Blažek | 2. 11. 2018 - 4. 11. 2018 | Own | | | |
Andrea Blažeková | 2. 11. 2018 - 4. 11. 2018 | Own | | | |
Tobiáš Boček | 31. 10. 2018 - 4. 11. 2018 | Own | | | |
František Bradáč | 26. 10. 2018 - 28. 10. 2018 | Own | | | |
Tomáš Brožek | 26. 10. 2018 - 30. 10. 2018 | Own | | | |
Jan Bucek | 31. 10. 2018 - 4. 11. 2018 | Organize by GHBS - only back | | | |
Eliška Budská | 29. 10. 2018 - 4. 11. 2018 | Own | | | |
Radek Bulíř | Throughout | Own | | | |
Pavel Cigáň | 26. 10. 2018 - 28. 10. 2018 | Own | | | |
Jakub Cipra | 1. 11. 2018 - 4. 11. 2018 | Own | | | |
Václav Cipra | 1. 11. 2018 - 4. 11. 2018 | Own | | | |
Marie Černá | 26. 10. 2018 - 31. 10. 2018 | Organized by GHBS - only there | | | |
David Čurčík | 1. 11. 2018 - 4. 11. 2018 | Own | | | |
Katrin Dejlová | 26. 10. 2018 - 30. 10. 2018 | Organized by GHBS - only there | | | |
Michaela Divišová | 27. 10. 2018 - 30. 10. 2018 | Own | | | |
Michaela Divišová | 1. 11. 2018 - 4. 11. 2018 | Own | | | |
Alena Drobníková | 26. 10. 2018 - 30. 10. 2018 | Own | | | |
Dan Drobný | 26. 10. 2018 - 28. 10. 2018 | Own | | | |
Ivan Drobný | 26. 10. 2018 - 28. 10. 2018 | Own | | | |
Vojtěch Dušek | 27. 10. 2018 - 30. 10. 2018 | Own | | | |
Matyáš Dvořák | Throughout | Own | | | |
Adam El-Dunia | 26. 10. 2018 - 28. 10. 2018 | Own | | | |
Ctibor Farkaš | 1. 11. 2018 - 4. 11. 2018 | Own | | | |
Jaroslav Farkaš | 1. 11. 2018 - 4. 11. 2018 | Own | | | |
Agáta Farkašová | 1. 11. 2018 - 4. 11. 2018 | Own | | | |
Anna Fialová | 26. 10. 2018 - 2. 11. 2018 | Own | | | |
Eliška Fischerová | Throughout | Own | | | |
Lucie Fischerová | Throughout | Own | | | |
Jaroslav Fory | 30. 10. 2018 - 1. 11. 2018 | Own | | | |
Ivana Foryová | 30. 10. 2018 - 1. 11. 2018 | Own | | | |
Matyáš Frinta | 1. 11. 2018 - 4. 11. 2018 | Own | | | |
Natalie Frintová | 1. 11. 2018 - 4. 11. 2018 | Own | | | |
Diana Fuňová | 26. 10. 2018 - 30. 10. 2018 | Own | | | |
Sandra Fuňová | 26. 10. 2018 - 30. 10. 2018 | Own | | | |
Eliška Fuxová | 26. 10. 2018 - 2. 11. 2018 | Own | | | |
Jiří Gregůrek | 2. 11. 2018 - 4. 11. 2018 | Own | | | |
Irena Gregůrková | 2. 11. 2018 - 4. 11. 2018 | Own | | | |
Petra Grygerková | 26. 10. 2018 - 28. 10. 2018 | Own | | | |
Marek Gugh | Throughout | Own | | | |
Pavel Hálek | 26. 10. 2018 - 28. 10. 2018 | Own | | | |
Gavin Halperin | 26. 10. 2018 - 30. 10. 2018 | Organized by GHBS - only there | | | |
Adam Hejtmánek | 26. 10. 2018 - 28. 10. 2018 | Own | | | |
Eliška Helebrantová | 26. 10. 2018 - 30. 10. 2018 | Own | | | |
Michaela Helebrantová | 26. 10. 2018 - 30. 10. 2018 | Own | | | |
SEBASTIAN HELLER | 30. 10. 2018 - 4. 11. 2018 | Own | | | |
Štěpán Horák | Throughout | Own | | | |
Čeněk Hořejší | 26. 10. 2018 - 29. 10. 2018 | Own | | | |
Ondřej Jakob | 31. 10. 2018 - 4. 11. 2018 | Own | | | |
Anna Jakobová | 29. 10. 2018 - 4. 11. 2018 | Own | | | |
Adéla Janoušková | 26. 10. 2018 - 30. 10. 2018 | Own | | | |
Linda Janoušková | 26. 10. 2018 - 30. 10. 2018 | Own | | | |
Elena Jedidi | 26. 10. 2018 - 30. 10. 2018 | Own | | | |
Lucie Jedličková | 26. 10. 2018 - 28. 10. 2018 | Own | | | |
Karolína Jindřichová | 2. 11. 2018 - 4. 11. 2018 | Own | | | |
Martin Kadeřábek | 28. 10. 2018 - 28. 10. 2018 | Own | | | |
Martin Kadeřábek | 3. 11. 2018 - 4. 11. 2018 | Own | | | |
Michal Kadeřábek | Throughout | Own | | | |
Kamil Káňová | 3. 11. 2018 - 4. 11. 2018 | Own | | | |
Kamila Káňová | 26. 10. 2018 - 28. 11. 2018 | Own | | | |
Jan Kaplan | 31. 10. 2018 - 4. 11. 2018 | Own | | | |
Jan Kaplan | 2. 11. 2018 - 4. 11. 2018 | Own | | | |
Lenka Kazdová | 26. 10. 2018 - 28. 10. 2018 | Own | | | |
Oliver Kislík | 2. 11. 2018 - 4. 11. 2018 | Own | | | |
Jan Klášterka | 26. 10. 2018 - 28. 10. 2018 | Own | | | |
Jaroslav Klášterka | 26. 10. 2018 - 28. 10. 2018 | Own | | | |
Daniela Komárková | 26. 10. 2018 - 30. 10. 2018 | Own | | | |
Filip Kořínek | 28. 10. 2018 - 4. 11. 2018 | Own | | | |
Miloš Kotlín | 26. 10. 2018 - 28. 10. 2018 | Own | | | |
Oldřich Kotlín | 26. 10. 2018 - 28. 10. 2018 | Own | | | |
Ladislav Koubek | 26. 10. 2018 - 28. 10. 2018 | Organized by GHBS - only there | | | |
Magdaléna Koubková | 26. 10. 2018 - 2. 11. 2018 | Organized by GHBS - only there | | | |
Kateřina Koudelková | 26. 10. 2018 - 28. 10. 2018 | Own | | | |
Adéla Krbcová | 26. 10. 2018 - 30. 10. 2018 | Own | | | |
Anna Krbcová | 26. 10. 2018 - 30. 10. 2018 | Own | | | |
Nikol Křížová | Throughout | Own | | | |
Adéla Kubátová | 26. 10. 2018 - 2. 11. 2018 | Own | | | |
Šárka Kudová | Throughout | Own | | | |
Johan Kvapil | 1. 11. 2018 - 4. 11. 2018 | Own | | | |
Martin Kvapil | 1. 11. 2018 - 4. 11. 2018 | Own | | | |
Matěj Kvapil | 1. 11. 2018 - 4. 11. 2018 | Own | | | |
Daniel Lachout | 1. 11. 2018 - 4. 11. 2018 | Own | | | |
Jiří Lachout | 1. 11. 2018 - 4. 11. 2018 | Own | | | |
Daniel Letovanec | 26. 10. 2018 - 1. 11. 2018 | Own | | | |
Kryštof Letovanec | 26. 10. 2018 - 1. 11. 2018 | Own | | | |
Matěj Letovanec | 26. 10. 2018 - 1. 11. 2018 | Own | | | |
David Lugar | 2. 11. 2018 - 4. 11. 2018 | Own | | | |
Karolína Lugarová | 2. 11. 2018 - 4. 11. 2018 | Own | | | |
Aneta Makovičková | 26. 10. 2018 - 30. 10. 2018 | Own | | | |
Gabriela Makovičková | 26. 10. 2018 - 30. 10. 2018 | Own | | | |
Alexandr Malý | 26. 10. 2018 - 31. 10. 2018 | Organized by GHBS - only there | | | |
Eduard Mareš | 26. 10. 2018 - 30. 10. 2018 | Organized by GHBS - only there | | | |
Vojtěch Mareš | 26. 10. 2018 - 30. 10. 2018 | Organized by GHBS - only there | | | |
Eliška Matějková | 27. 10. 2018 - 30. 10. 2018 | Own | | | |
Petr Materna | 26. 10. 2018 - 28. 10. 2018 | Own | | | |
Štěpán Materna | 26. 10. 2018 - 28. 10. 2018 | Own | | | |
Barbora Meduňová | 26. 10. 2018 - 30. 10. 2018 | Own | | | |
Tereza Meduňová | 26. 10. 2018 - 30. 10. 2018 | Own | | | |
Daniel Milbach | 1. 11. 2018 - 4. 11. 2018 | Own | | | |
Marcela Minaříková | Throughout | Own | | | |
Matěj Mišovic | 27. 10. 2018 - 30. 10. 2018 | Own | | | |
Richard ml. Mitro | 2. 11. 2018 - 4. 11. 2018 | Own | | | |
Robert Mitro | 2. 11. 2018 - 4. 11. 2018 | Own | | | |
Robert ml. Mitro | 2. 11. 2018 - 4. 11. 2018 | Own | | | |
Antonín Mládek | Throughout | Own | | | |
Daniel Mucha | 2. 11. 2018 - 4. 11. 2018 | Own | | | |
Nikol Nebehayová | 26. 10. 2018 - 29. 10. 2018 | Own | | | |
Petr Novotný | 26. 10. 2018 - 30. 10. 2018 | Own | | | |
Jana Odstrčilová | 26. 10. 2018 - 30. 10. 2018 | Own | | | |
Jana Odstrčilová | 2. 11. 2018 - 4. 11. 2018 | Own | | | |
Filip Olšan | 27. 10. 2018 - 30. 10. 2018 | Own | | | |
yonatan omer | 2. 11. 2018 - 4. 11. 2018 | Own | | | |
yoram omer | 2. 11. 2018 - 4. 11. 2018 | Own | | | |
Šárka Opičková | 26. 10. 2018 - 28. 10. 2018 | Own | | | |
Martin Osvald | 2. 11. 2018 - 4. 11. 2018 | Own | | | |
Mariana Pacovská | 26. 10. 2018 - 30. 10. 2018 | Own | | | |
Ondřej Parchomenko | 26. 10. 2018 - 29. 10. 2018 | Own | | | |
Šimon Pavelec | Throughout | Own | | | |
Antonín Pavelka | Throughout | Own | | | |
Jindřich Pavelka | Throughout | Own | | | |
Vojtěch Pavelka | Throughout | Own | | | |
Zdeněk Pavelka | Throughout | Own | | | |
Marek Pavlas | 27. 10. 2018 - 30. 10. 2018 | Own | | | |
Ondřej Pavlas | 27. 10. 2018 - 30. 10. 2018 | Own | | | |
ADAM Pavlovský | 1. 11. 2018 - 4. 11. 2018 | Own | | | |
Pavel Pavlovský | 1. 11. 2018 - 4. 11. 2018 | Own | | | |
Markéta Pechholdová | 2. 11. 2018 - 4. 11. 2018 | Own | | | |
Matěj Perník | 2. 11. 2018 - 4. 11. 2018 | Own | | | |
Veronika Petrová | Throughout | Organized by GHBS - only there | | | |
Kristýna Pištolová | 2. 11. 2018 - 4. 11. 2018 | Own | | | |
Lenka Pištolová | 2. 11. 2018 - 4. 11. 2018 | Own | | | |
František Pitrák | 2. 11. 2018 - 4. 11. 2018 | Own | | | |
Eliška Pjenčáková | 2. 11. 2018 - 4. 11. 2018 | Own | | | |
David Povýšil | 26. 10. 2018 - 28. 10. 2018 | Own | | | |
Viktor Jan Príkazský | 31. 10. 2018 - 4. 11. 2018 | Own | | | |
Adam Jiří Procházka | Throughout | Own | | | |
David Procházka | 2. 11. 2018 - 4. 11. 2018 | Own | | | |
Matěj Procházka | 2. 11. 2018 - 4. 11. 2018 | Own | | | |
Michal Procházka | 26. 10. 2018 - 28. 10. 2018 | Own | | | |
Natálie Procházková | 2. 11. 2018 - 4. 11. 2018 | Own | | | |
Lukáš Rydrych | Throughout | Own | | | |
Monika Ryšavá | 1. 11. 2018 - 4. 11. 2018 | Own | | | |
David Sahula | 27. 10. 2018 - 31. 10. 2018 | Own | | | |
Vít Sahula | 27. 10. 2018 - 31. 10. 2018 | Own | | | |
Julie Sejkorová | 26. 10. 2018 - 28. 10. 2018 | Own | | | |
Tereza Sejkorová | 26. 10. 2018 - 28. 10. 2018 | Own | | | |
Zuzana Sejkorová | 26. 10. 2018 - 28. 10. 2018 | Own | | | |
Petr Selichar | 26. 10. 2018 - 30. 10. 2018 | Own | | | |
Hana Selicharová | 26. 10. 2018 - 30. 10. 2018 | Own | | | |
Lenka Seménková | 2. 11. 2018 - 4. 11. 2018 | Own | | | |
Petr Skalický | 27. 10. 2018 - 30. 10. 2018 | Own | | | |
Vít Skalický | 27. 10. 2018 - 30. 10. 2018 | Own | | | |
Barbora Smrčinová | Throughout | Own | | | |
Vojtěch Smrž | Throughout | Organize by GHBS - only back | | | |
Kryštof Snížek | 27. 10. 2018 - 29. 10. 2018 | Own | | | |
Daniela Stachová | 26. 10. 2018 - 28. 10. 2018 | Own | | | |
Erika Stanoeva | 28. 10. 2018 - 30. 11. 2018 | Own | | | |
Marie Antonie Stibůrková | 26. 10. 2018 - 30. 10. 2018 | Own | | | |
Maxmilián Suchan | 2. 11. 2018 - 4. 11. 2018 | Own | | | |
Zuzana Suchanová | 2. 11. 2018 - 4. 11. 2018 | Own | | | |
Robin Svatek | 26. 11. 2018 - 29. 11. 2018 | Own | | | |
Zdeněk Svatek | 27. 10. 2018 - 30. 10. 2018 | Own | | | |
Blanka Svatková | 26. 10. 2018 - 28. 10. 2018 | Own | | | |
Daniel Svoboda | 1. 11. 2018 - 4. 11. 2018 | Own | | | |
Tomáš Svoboda | 26. 10. 2018 - 28. 10. 2018 | Own | | | |
Andrea Svobodová | 1. 11. 2018 - 4. 11. 2018 | Own | | | |
Denisa Svobodová | Throughout | Organized by GBHS - both | | | |
Jaroslav Sýkora | 28. 10. 2018 - 30. 10. 2018 | Own | | | |
Lukáš Sýkora | 28. 10. 2018 - 30. 10. 2018 | Own | | | |
Lenka Sýkorová | 28. 10. 2018 - 30. 10. 2018 | Own | | | |
Štěpán Šafařík | 2. 11. 2018 - 4. 11. 2018 | Own | | | |
Jan Šikl | 31. 10. 2018 - 4. 11. 2018 | Own | | | |
Jan Šikl starší | 31. 10. 2018 - 4. 11. 2018 | Own | | | |
Dominik Šindelář | 2. 11. 2018 - 4. 11. 2018 | Own | | | |
Stanislav Šindelář | 2. 11. 2018 - 4. 11. 2018 | Own | | | |
Patrik Šmejkal | 2. 11. 2018 - 4. 11. 2018 | Own | | | |
Eva Šmejkalová | 2. 11. 2018 - 4. 11. 2018 | Own | | | |
Vojtěch Šotola | 26. 10. 2018 - 28. 10. 2018 | Own | | | |
Marie Šprinclová | 2. 11. 2018 - 4. 11. 2018 | Own | | | |
Josef Šrámek | 1. 11. 2018 - 4. 11. 2018 | Own | | | |
Václav Šrámek | 26. 10. 2018 - 28. 10. 2018 | Own | | | |
Helena Šrámková | 1. 11. 2018 - 4. 11. 2018 | Own | | | |
Jolana Šrámková | 1. 11. 2018 - 4. 11. 2018 | Own | | | |
Kristián Šticha | 2. 11. 2018 - 4. 11. 2018 | Organize by GHBS - only back | | | |
Sebastián Šticha | 2. 11. 2018 - 4. 11. 2018 | Organize by GHBS - only back | | | |
Petra Táborská | 2. 11. 2018 - 4. 11. 2018 | Own | | | |
Hynek Toman | 2. 11. 2018 - 4. 11. 2018 | Own | | | |
Kateřina Tomanová | 2. 11. 2018 - 4. 11. 2018 | Own | | | |
Vilma Tomanová | 2. 11. 2018 - 4. 11. 2018 | Own | | | |
Michal Trunda | 2. 11. 2018 - 4. 11. 2018 | Own | | | |
Mária Trundová | 2. 11. 2018 - 4. 11. 2018 | Own | | | |
František Tůma | 31. 10. 2018 - 4. 11. 2018 | Own | | | |
Matěj Ungrman | 26. 10. 2018 - 29. 10. 2018 | Own | | | |
Eva Ungrmanová | 26. 10. 2018 - 29. 10. 2018 | Own | | | |
Jiří Přemysl Urban | 27. 10. 2018 - 29. 10. 2018 | Own | | | |
Ondřej Urban | 27. 10. 2018 - 29. 10. 2018 | Own | | | |
Aleš Varga | 2. 11. 2018 - 4. 11. 2018 | Own | | | |
František Varga | 2. 11. 2018 - 4. 11. 2018 | Own | | | |
Vojtěch Veverka | 2. 11. 2018 - 4. 11. 2018 | Own | | | |
Petr Vildman | 2. 11. 2018 - 4. 11. 2018 | Own | | | |
Šimon Vildman | 2. 11. 2018 - 4. 11. 2018 | Own | | | |
Lenka Vildmanová | 2. 11. 2018 - 4. 11. 2018 | Own | | | |
Daniel Vlček | 26. 10. 2018 - 28. 10. 2018 | Own | | | |
Marek Vobořil | 1. 11. 2018 - 4. 11. 2018 | Own | | | |
Jitka Vobořilová | 1. 11. 2018 - 4. 11. 2018 | Own | | | |
Denisa Vojkůvková | 2. 11. 2018 - 4. 11. 2018 | Own | | | |
Milan Volf | 1. 11. 2018 - 4. 11. 2018 | Own | | | |
Viktor Volf | 1. 11. 2018 - 4. 11. 2018 | Own | | | |
Pavla Vorlíčková | 26. 10. 2018 - 28. 10. 2018 | Own | | | |
Tereza Vorlíčková | 26. 10. 2018 - 28. 10. 2018 | Own | | | |
Aneta Vostrá | 1. 11. 2018 - 4. 11. 2018 | Own | | | |
Vojtěch Vostrý | 2. 11. 2018 - 4. 11. 2018 | Own | | | |
Karel Weishaupl | 2. 11. 2018 - 4. 11. 2018 | Own | | | |
Lucie Wollmuthová | 1. 11. 2018 - 4. 11. 2018 | Own | | | |
Monika Wollmuthová | 1. 11. 2018 - 4. 11. 2018 | Own | | | |
Radek Záhejský | 26. 10. 2018 - 28. 10. 2018 | Own | | | |
Martin Zámečník | Throughout | Own | | | |
Kateřina Zimmermannová | 28. 10. 2018 - 30. 10. 2018 | Own | | | |
Milan Zítka | 2. 11. 2018 - 4. 11. 2018 | Own | | | |